Contains among other things: Discussion at the Führer's Chancellery on 6 March 1942 (transcript of the minutes of the meeting)
Contains among other things: The culture of Manihot Glaziovii and the extraction and preparation of rubber in East Africa P. Wolff, A visit to the countries of Lake Chad F. Wolff, The economic area of the Kano railway in northern Nigeria
Contains among other things: Confidential commercial information on colonial products
Contains among other things: Economic situation of the then D e u t s c h - O s t a f r i k a after the 1st World War. - Report of the Legation Council Gunzert of October 1928
Contains: Memorandum on preparatory work for mobilization in the event of a war with a great power for D e u t s c h - O s t a f r i k a , April 1912; "Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika" - Records of the Major General von Lettow-Vorbeck on contrasts between command and governor Schnee, without date; excerpts from letters to General von Lettow, 1914-1916
Contains among other things: Testimonial booklets as Kadett 1881-1882 Testimonial booklets as Kadett 1883-1887 Appointment as Portepee Ensign in 4th Guard Regiment on Foot, Feb. 7, 1888 Testimony of Maturity as Officer, Dec. 24, 1888 Appointment as Seconde Lieutenant, Feb. 17, 1888 Granting of Permission to Carry the Name of Lettow-Vorbeck, Feb. 30, 1888 March 1891 appointed Premier-Lieutenant, 30 May 1895 certificate of the Kriegsakademie, 31 Oct. 1898 appointed Captain, 23 Oct. 1901 certificate of employment as Captain of the Schutztruppe, 23 March 1901 transferred from East Asian Expeditionary Corps to Queen Elisabeth Garde-Grenadier-Regiment No. 3, Sept. 9, 1901 Command to the Great General Staff, Sept. 14, 1906 Appointment as Major of the Infantry, March 22, 1907 Appointment as Lieutenant Colonel of the Marine Infantry, Oct. 1, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika, Oct. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika, Sept. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika, Sept. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika, Sept. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the German Army, Sept. 12, 196 Appointment as Major of the Infantry, March 22, 1907 Appointment as Lieutenant Colonel of the Marine Infantry, Oct. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Schutz. Dec. 1913 promotion to Major General, Oct. 29, 1917 permission to carry on the uniform of the Schutztruppe, March 1, 1919 appointment as leader of a Reichswehr brigade, March 9, 1919 resignation from the Reichswehr, Sept. 30, 1919
Vorbeck, Paul Emil von LettowContains among other things: Map of Africa, 1:14 500 000, C. Flemming in Glogau, 1888
Enthält u.a.: Amended Regulations respecting the Importation, Exportation, Storage and Disposal of fire-arms, ammunition and gun-powder in the British Protectorate of Zanzibar and Pemba Islands, Dec. 23. 1892
Enthält u.a.: East Africa Protectorate. Regulations as to fire-arms, 1896 -1904