'Akonolinga. - Establishment of the post by Captain Dominik
Gouvernement von KamerunContains: Memorandum on preparatory work for mobilization in the event of a war with a great power for D e u t s c h - O s t a f r i k a , April 1912; "Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika" - Records of the Major General von Lettow-Vorbeck on contrasts between command and governor Schnee, without date; excerpts from letters to General von Lettow, 1914-1916
Contains among other things: Testimonial booklets as Kadett 1881-1882 Testimonial booklets as Kadett 1883-1887 Appointment as Portepee Ensign in 4th Guard Regiment on Foot, Feb. 7, 1888 Testimony of Maturity as Officer, Dec. 24, 1888 Appointment as Seconde Lieutenant, Feb. 17, 1888 Granting of Permission to Carry the Name of Lettow-Vorbeck, Feb. 30, 1888 March 1891 appointed Premier-Lieutenant, 30 May 1895 certificate of the Kriegsakademie, 31 Oct. 1898 appointed Captain, 23 Oct. 1901 certificate of employment as Captain of the Schutztruppe, 23 March 1901 transferred from East Asian Expeditionary Corps to Queen Elisabeth Garde-Grenadier-Regiment No. 3, Sept. 9, 1901 Command to the Great General Staff, Sept. 14, 1906 Appointment as Major of the Infantry, March 22, 1907 Appointment as Lieutenant Colonel of the Marine Infantry, Oct. 1, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika, Oct. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika, Sept. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika, Sept. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika, Sept. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Commander of the German Army, Sept. 12, 196 Appointment as Major of the Infantry, March 22, 1907 Appointment as Lieutenant Colonel of the Marine Infantry, Oct. 12, 1913 Command as representative of the Schutz. Dec. 1913 promotion to Major General, Oct. 29, 1917 permission to carry on the uniform of the Schutztruppe, March 1, 1919 appointment as leader of a Reichswehr brigade, March 9, 1919 resignation from the Reichswehr, Sept. 30, 1919
Vorbeck, Paul Emil von LettowDrucksachen
Nigmann, ErnstContains: Volume 1911, No. 9-12; Volume 1912, No. 1-12; Volume 1913, No. 1-12; Volume 1914, No. 1-7;
Drucksachen
Nigmann, ErnstContains among other things: Instruction for the Maritime Officer (Reproduction) attached to the Government of D e u t s c h - O s t a f r i k a, 14 March 1891 Act concerning the Emperors. Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika (print), 1891 Organizational regulations for the Kaiserl. Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika (print), 9 Apr. 1891 Budget for the East African protectorate for the budget year 1891/1892 (draft, reproduction), 1891 clothing regulations for the Kaiserl. Protection Force (transcript), 4 June 1891
Contains among other things: Leading the German war flag at authorities and institutions of the Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika (AKO, copy), Aug. 21, 1893 Reorganization of the officers' corps of the Schutztruppe (memorandum, duplication), Oct. 31, 1893
Drucksachen
Nigmann, ErnstContains: Eugen Buhl, Deutschostafrika im Weltkriege Heinrich Sachers, Christmas on blasting patrol Karl Heidtmann, As outpost on an island in Lake Victoria August Hauer, As front doctor in the course of Lettows Dr. Carl Peters, The hero struggle for Deutsch-Ostafrika Captain Freiherr von Hammerstein, Schutztruppe für Deutsch-Ostafrika Paul Mercier, Indigenous troops during the German East African campaign Is colonial possession useful for Germany?
Vorbeck, Paul Emil von Lettow